# Help with questions please! :)

• Oct 25th 2012, 11:36 AM
JDC182
Any smart people care to help me out with a couple of questions I am stuck on?

1)
Show three methods that could be used to calculate 26 x 12 without using formal multiplication algorithms. Explain which of these is most efficient and why.

2)

1. Use words or symbols to state the distributive law for multiplication over addition.

2. Explain how the distributive law can be used to calculate 59 x 73 + 59 x 27 mentally.
• Oct 25th 2012, 11:41 AM
Plato
Re: Help with questions please! :)
Quote:

Originally Posted by JDC182
1)
Show three methods that could be used to calculate 26 x 12 without using formal multiplication algorithms. Explain which of these is most efficient and why.

$\displaystyle 26\times 12=26(10+2)=260+52=~?$
• Oct 25th 2012, 04:41 PM
Soroban
Re: Help with questions please! :)
Hello, JDC182!

Quote:

2. Explain how the distributive law can be used to calculate 59 x 73 + 59 x 27 mentally.

$\displaystyle 59\times73 + 59\times 27 \;=\; 59 \times (73 + 27) \;=\;59\times 100 \;=\;5900$