it is not correct.
use the distributive property ax(b+c) = ab+ac
in your case 25x38=25x(40-2) =25x40-2x25= 1000 - 50 = 950 the correct answer.
Maria is working on the multiplication problem 38*25. Maria says, 4 times 25 is 100, so 40 time 25 is 1000. Now take away 2, so the answer is 998.
Is Maria's method correct or not? If it is correct, write equations that incorporate Maria's work and then show why it's correct. If Maria's reasoning is not correct, work with the portions that are right to correct Maria's work and write a string of equations that corresponds to your corrected method for calculating 38*25. Write your equations in the following form:
This follows immediately from the distributive law.
38 x 25 = (40 - 2) x 25 = 40 x 25 - 2 x 25.