Results 1 to 3 of 3

Math Help - Urgent Help Needed PLEASE

  1. #1
    Newbie
    Joined
    Feb 2007
    Posts
    9

    Unhappy Urgent Help Needed PLEASE

    Hi i am trying to solve a number grid problem by 4x4 block finding the product of the top left number and the bottom right number in the block doing the same with the top right and bottom left numbers. Calculating the difference so far this is what i have done

    1 2 3 4
    11 12 13 14
    21 22 23 24
    31 32 33 34

    I have chosen 1 as the upper left
    Multiply 1 x 12 x 23 x 34 = 9384
    Multiply 4 x 13 x 22 x 31 = 35464
    Difference = 26080

    Next 4x4 block

    2 3 4 5
    12 13 14 15
    22 23 24 25
    32 33 34 35

    Multiply 2 x 13 x 24 x 35 =21840
    Multiply 5 x 14 x 23 x 32 = 51520
    Difference = 29680

    Notice that there is a difference of 3600 between the 1st and the 2nd block (29680 - 2608 = 3600)

    I then did another 4x4 block where 3 was the upper left and another 4x4 block 4 as the upper left and got a difference of 3800 i am so confused can any kind person pls explain am i doing this right and how can i generate a formula of D (DIFFERENCE) involving N (NUMBER OF SQUARES). your help would be very much appreciated also if you can explain the 5x5 block
    Thank you
    Follow Math Help Forum on Facebook and Google+

  2. #2
    Forum Admin topsquark's Avatar
    Joined
    Jan 2006
    From
    Wellsville, NY
    Posts
    10,184
    Thanks
    403
    Awards
    1
    Quote Originally Posted by nbukhari View Post
    Hi i am trying to solve a number grid problem by 4x4 block finding the product of the top left number and the bottom right number in the block doing the same with the top right and bottom left numbers. Calculating the difference so far this is what i have done

    1 2 3 4
    11 12 13 14
    21 22 23 24
    31 32 33 34

    I have chosen 1 as the upper left
    Multiply 1 x 12 x 23 x 34 = 9384
    Multiply 4 x 13 x 22 x 31 = 35464
    Difference = 26080

    Next 4x4 block

    2 3 4 5
    12 13 14 15
    22 23 24 25
    32 33 34 35

    Multiply 2 x 13 x 24 x 35 =21840
    Multiply 5 x 14 x 23 x 32 = 51520
    Difference = 29680

    Notice that there is a difference of 3600 between the 1st and the 2nd block (29680 - 2608 = 3600)

    I then did another 4x4 block where 3 was the upper left and another 4x4 block 4 as the upper left and got a difference of 3800 i am so confused can any kind person pls explain am i doing this right and how can i generate a formula of D (DIFFERENCE) involving N (NUMBER OF SQUARES). your help would be very much appreciated also if you can explain the 5x5 block
    Thank you
    I am assuming the number block is 10x(something)?

    If you have a 4x4 block and a number n in the upper left corner, then the next number in the diagonal leading to the lower right corner will be n + 11, the number after that will be (n + 11) + 11 = n + 22, and the last number in the diagonal (the lower right corner) will be (n + 22) + 11. So the product along this diagonal will be:
    n(n + 11)(n + 22)(n + 33)

    To do the other diagonal, the number in the top right corner will be n + 3, the next number in the diagonal will be (n + 3) + 9 = n + 12, then (n + 12) + 9 = n + 21, then (n + 21) + 9. This product will be:
    (n + 3)(n + 12)(n + 21)(n + 30)

    So the difference formula will be:
    (n + 3)(n + 12)(n + 21)(n + 30) -
    n(n + 11)(n + 22)(n + 33)

    Now for the ugly part. You really ought to multiply these out and find the difference. I get:
    100n^2 + 3300n + 22680

    -Dan
    Follow Math Help Forum on Facebook and Google+

  3. #3
    Super Member

    Joined
    May 2006
    From
    Lexington, MA (USA)
    Posts
    11,860
    Thanks
    742
    Hello, nbukhari!

    I'm still working on the 55 problem,
    . . but I can verify what Dan did for the 44.

    At the same time, I'll dazzle you with some algebraic gymnastics (I hope).


    Reading down the southeast diagonal, the product is:

    . . n(n + 11)(n + 22)(n + 33)

    . . . = .[n(n + 33)][(n + 11)(n + 22)]

    . . . = .(n + 33)(n + 33n + 242)

    . . . = .[(n + 33n + 121) - 121][(n + 33n + 121) + 121]

    . . . = .(n + 33n + 121) - 121


    Reading down the southwest diagonal, the product is:

    . . (n + 3)(n + 12)(n + 21)(n + 30)

    . . . = .[(n + 3)(n + 30)][(n + 12)(n + 21)]

    . . . = .(n + 33n + 90)(n + 33n + 252)

    . . . = .[(n + 33n + 171) - 81][(n + 33n + 171) + 81]

    . . . = .(n + 33n + 171) - 81


    The difference is: .[(n + 33n + 171) - 81] - [(n + 33n + 121) - 121]

    . . . = .(n + 33n + 171) - (n + 33n + 121) + 121 - 81
    . . . . . \_______________________________/
    . . . . . . . . . . . . .
    difference of squares

    . . . = .[(n + 33n + 171) - (n + 33n + 121)][(n + 33n + 171) + (n + 33n + 121)] + 8080

    . . . = .50(2n + 66n + 292) + 8080

    . . . = .100n + 3300n + 22680 . . . . There!

    Follow Math Help Forum on Facebook and Google+

Similar Math Help Forum Discussions

  1. urgent help needed
    Posted in the Algebra Forum
    Replies: 1
    Last Post: January 7th 2009, 01:52 PM
  2. Urgent Help Needed! Any Help Will Do
    Posted in the Business Math Forum
    Replies: 1
    Last Post: October 10th 2008, 06:21 AM
  3. URGENT Help Needed
    Posted in the Algebra Forum
    Replies: 3
    Last Post: July 3rd 2008, 02:08 PM
  4. Urgent Help Needed
    Posted in the Math Topics Forum
    Replies: 3
    Last Post: November 18th 2007, 06:41 PM
  5. urgent help needed!!!!!!!!!
    Posted in the Algebra Forum
    Replies: 5
    Last Post: October 12th 2007, 10:55 AM

Search Tags


/mathhelpforum @mathhelpforum